+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 177.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2016.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2016: House Vote on SB 384, FINAL PASSAGE (#669)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
April 20, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 384, FINAL PASSAGE (#354)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor