+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 39.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/25/2021.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2021: House Vote on SB 37, FINAL PASSAGE (#553)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
April 28, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 37, FINAL PASSAGE (#151)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor