+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/1/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 666.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 26. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (5)
May 17, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 364, CONCUR (#1267)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
May 15, 2018: House Vote on SB 364, AMENDMENT # 4585 BY SMITH, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1117)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 53
- Absent: 19
May 15, 2018: House Vote on SB 364, FINAL PASSAGE (#1118)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 20
April 11, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 364, FINAL PASSAGE (#370)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
April 11, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 364, CO-AUTHORS (#371)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor