+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37.
- Effective date 7/1/2021.
On October 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On October 23, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On October 20, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Reported with amendments. (14-0) Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On October 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On October 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
October 22, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 34, CONCUR (#178)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
October 21, 2020: House Vote on SB 34, FINAL PASSAGE (#219)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
October 13, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 34, FINAL PASSAGE (#83)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor