+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Involuntarily deferred in committee.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 6, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 336, FINAL PASSAGE (#180)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor