+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 26.
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2019: House Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#587)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
April 17, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#73)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor