+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/2/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 325.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2016.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2016: House Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#925)
- Yeas: 82
- Absent: 22
April 27, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 31, SB 31 BY MILLS (#423)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor