+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/17/2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 340.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013.
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report received.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Carter, and Robideaux.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Appel, and Heitmeier.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2013.
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
June 5, 2013: House Vote on SB 31, MOTION TO ADOPT (#915)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
June 4, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 31, ADOPT (#980)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 27, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 31, REJECT (#596)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 20, 2013: House Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#489)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 16
April 17, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 31, FINAL PASSAGE (#68)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
April 17, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 31, CO-AUTHORS (#69)
- Yeas: 17
- Absent: 22
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor