+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/1/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 859.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Riser, and Walsworth.
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
- House conferees appointed: Arnold, Adams, and Leger.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2014.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
June 2, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 294, ADOPT (#1734)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
June 2, 2014: House Vote on SB 294, MOTION TO CONSIDER ON FINAL DAY (#1643)
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 18
June 2, 2014: House Vote on SB 294, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1644)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 14
June 1, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 294, REJECT (#1638)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
May 30, 2014: House Vote on SB 294, FINAL PASSAGE (#1490)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 9
May 5, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 294, FINAL PASSAGE (#676)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor