+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Involuntarily deferred in committee.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Substitute for Senate Bill No. 223. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 25, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 284, FINAL PASSAGE (#465)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor