+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 20, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 282, FINAL PASSAGE (#417)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor