+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 745.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (5-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 274, CONCUR (#1519)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 28, 2014: House Vote on SB 274, FINAL PASSAGE (#1313)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 12
April 7, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 274, FINAL PASSAGE (#305)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor