+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 20.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 272, CONCUR (#419)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 16, 2018: House Vote on SB 272, FINAL PASSAGE (#459)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
March 20, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 272, FINAL PASSAGE (#96)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor