+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor