+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Becomes Act No. 717
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/18.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 263, CONCUR (#641)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 27, 2018: House Vote on SB 263, FINAL PASSAGE (#615)
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 19
April 2, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 263, FINAL PASSAGE (#189)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor