+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/14/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 497.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 12. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2016.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (7-5). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2016: House Vote on SB 260, FINAL PASSAGE (#1061)
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 16
April 27, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 260, FINAL PASSAGE (#425)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor