+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/22/2017.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 327.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substitute for Senate Bill No. 126. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2017: House Vote on SB 256, FINAL PASSAGE (#776)
- Yeas: 102
- Absent: 3
May 22, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 256, FINAL PASSAGE (#396)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor