+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor