+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 7, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 241, FINAL PASSAGE (#297)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor