+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 293.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2014.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 241, CONCUR (#1088)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
May 14, 2014: House Vote on SB 241, AMENDMENT # 5190 BY WILLIAMS, A., MOTION TO ADOPT (#925)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 16
May 14, 2014: House Vote on SB 241, FINAL PASSAGE (#926)
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 14
April 7, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 241, FINAL PASSAGE (#302)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor