+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor