+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/14/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 296.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 239, CONCUR (#979)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 3
June 3, 2021: House Vote on SB 239, FINAL PASSAGE (#988)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 14
April 28, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 239, FINAL PASSAGE (#173)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor