+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 694.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2014.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (5-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 235, CONCUR (#1387)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
May 22, 2014: House Vote on SB 235, FINAL PASSAGE (#1182)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 11
April 7, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 235, FINAL PASSAGE (#301)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor