+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 294.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 234, CONCUR (#996)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
June 7, 2021: House Vote on SB 234, FINAL PASSAGE (#1045)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
May 18, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 234, FINAL PASSAGE (#402)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor