+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 218.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2018: House Vote on SB 23, FINAL PASSAGE (#696)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
March 21, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 23, FINAL PASSAGE (#107)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor