+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/1/2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 169.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2015.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 222, CONCUR (#636)
- Yeas: 39
June 1, 2015: House Vote on SB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#623)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
April 29, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#160)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor