+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 11/1/2017.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 282.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 23 yeas and 11 nays.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 17. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for May 16, 2017.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 221, CONCUR (#885)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 4
June 5, 2017: House Vote on SB 221, FINAL PASSAGE (#770)
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
May 16, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 221, FINAL PASSAGE (#317)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor