+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/4/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 108.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2021: House Vote on SB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#807)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
May 12, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#355)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor