+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/14/2017.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 253.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 215, CONCUR (#785)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 1
June 2, 2017: House Vote on SB 215, FINAL PASSAGE (#672)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 15
May 9, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 215, FINAL PASSAGE (#255)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor