+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 393.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Rules suspended.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (4)
June 8, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 215, CONCUR (#993)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 1
June 7, 2021: House Vote on SB 215, FINAL PASSAGE (#1054)
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 7
May 20, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 215, FINAL PASSAGE (#418)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
May 20, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 215, CO-AUTHORS (#419)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (51)
Regina Ashford Barrow
Type:
Primary Sponsor