+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
On October 23, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 27. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On October 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Reported with amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20.
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On September 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On November 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
October 23, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 20, CONCUR (#224)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
October 22, 2020: House Vote on SB 20, FINAL PASSAGE (#244)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 19
October 1, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 20, FINAL PASSAGE (#17)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor