+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/15/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 303.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 76, nays 25. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Rules suspended.
- Conference Committee report received.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Bourriaque, Bishop, and Dustin Miller.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Cathey, Hensgens, and Price.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 17. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (9-2). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 10, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 197, ADOPT (#1067)
- Yeas: 38
June 10, 2021: House Vote on SB 197, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1249)
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 4
June 8, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 197, REJECT (#978)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2021: House Vote on SB 197, FINAL PASSAGE (#986)
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 14
April 20, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 197, FINAL PASSAGE (#71)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor