+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/1/2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 96.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 196, CONCUR (#609)
- Yeas: 39
May 22, 2013: House Vote on SB 196, FINAL PASSAGE (#563)
- Yeas: 79
- Absent: 26
April 24, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 196, FINAL PASSAGE (#161)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor