+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/30/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 103.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10--0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 13, 2014: House Vote on SB 19, FINAL PASSAGE (#895)
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 3
May 13, 2014: House Vote on SB 19, FINAL PASSAGE (#895)
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 3
April 2, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 19, CO-AUTHORS (#244)
- Yeas: 30
- Absent: 9
April 2, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 19, FINAL PASSAGE (#245)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (100)
Type:
Primary Sponsor