+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/26/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 192.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2016.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2016: House Vote on SB 189, FINAL PASSAGE (#754)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 11
April 11, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 189, FINAL PASSAGE (#217)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor