+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 19, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 188, FINAL PASSAGE (#251)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor