+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/28/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 289.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2014.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2014: House Vote on SB 187, FINAL PASSAGE (#962)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 15
April 21, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 187, FINAL PASSAGE (#435)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor