+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Reported favorably (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2020: House Vote on SB 183, FINAL PASSAGE (#565)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
May 15, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 183, FINAL PASSAGE (#222)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor