+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 413.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/19.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Foil, Gregory Miller, and Mack.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Hewitt, and Luneau.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2019: House Vote on SB 182, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1028)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
June 5, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 182, ADOPT (#1006)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 182, REJECT (#931)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
June 2, 2019: House Vote on SB 182, FINAL PASSAGE (#831)
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 4
May 22, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 182, FINAL PASSAGE (#452)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor