+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 193.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (20-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 180, CONCUR (#668)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 30, 2019: House Vote on SB 180, FINAL PASSAGE (#722)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
May 7, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 180, FINAL PASSAGE (#273)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor