+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/17/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 531.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 179, CONCUR (#1262)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
June 1, 2016: House Vote on SB 179, FINAL PASSAGE (#1152)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
April 7, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 179, FINAL PASSAGE (#194)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor