+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/20/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 363.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
- Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 177, CONCUR (#1087)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2018: House Vote on SB 177, FINAL PASSAGE (#878)
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 16
April 9, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 177, FINAL PASSAGE (#294)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor