+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 4/20/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/06/18.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2018: House Vote on SB 174, FINAL PASSAGE (#319)
- Yeas: 82
- Absent: 23
March 19, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 174, FINAL PASSAGE (#78)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor