+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 11 yeas and 24 nays.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 29, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 164, FINAL PASSAGE (#81)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor