+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 355.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 7 nays.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2013.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 45. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 4, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 164, CONCUR (#965)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
June 3, 2013: House Vote on SB 164, FINAL PASSAGE (#798)
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 16
May 29, 2013: House Vote on SB 164, FINAL PASSAGE (#660)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 9
May 13, 2013: House Vote on SB 164, COMMERCE (#357)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 15
May 7, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 164, FINAL PASSAGE (#300)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor