+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Involuntarily deferred in committee.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 8, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 162, FINAL PASSAGE (#212)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor