+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/29/2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 30.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2015.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2015: House Vote on SB 159, FINAL PASSAGE (#389)
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 20
April 29, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 159, FINAL PASSAGE (#156)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor