+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/4/2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 94.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 159, CONCUR (#813)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
May 30, 2013: House Vote on SB 159, FINAL PASSAGE (#701)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
May 6, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 159, FINAL PASSAGE (#260)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor