+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 474.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2016: House Vote on SB 150, FINAL PASSAGE (#1102)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
May 4, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 150, FINAL PASSAGE (#579)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor