+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (6-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 22, 2013: Senate Vote on SB 15, SB 15 BY PERRY (#111)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor